Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sasikaran Perinpanayagam, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ronald S Yuro, against 0 Abc Corporations 1-1, Christoph Santaiti, John Does 1-10, represented by Donna E Geoghan, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, NJ, . Middlesex County, NJ Superior Courts with Bruce Kaplan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBruce Kaplan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by YURO, RONALD, S of LEVINSON AXELROD on behalf of SASIKARAN PERINPANAYAGAM against CHRISTOPH SANTAITI, JOHN DOES 1-10 | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION [LCV20232975190] -Discovery is extended to 12/22/2023 per R. 4:24-1 (c). | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by GEOGHAN, DONNA, E of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE CO on behalf of CHRISTOPH SANTAITI against SASIKARAN PERINPANAYAGAM | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by GEOGHAN, DONNA, E of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE CO on behalf of CHRISTOPH SANTAITI against SASIKARAN PERINPANAYAGAM | |
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20224448594] -Defendant is not in default. | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by YURO, RONALD, S of LEVINSON AXELROD on behalf of SASIKARAN PERINPANAYAGAM against CHRISTOPH SANTAITI, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for MID-L-004719-22 submitted by YURO, RONALD S, LEVINSON AXELROD on behalf of SASIKARAN PERINPANAYAGAM against CHRISTOPH SANTAITI, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.