Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Michelle Olk, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Steven M Tanenbaum, against Abc Corp. 1-5, John Doe 1-5, Renaissance Ctr At North Bruns, Shoprite Of North Brunswick, in the jurisdiction of Middlesex County, NJ, . Middlesex County, NJ Superior Courts with Bruce Kaplan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBruce Kaplan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiddlesex County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL submitted by KOBLENTZ, HARLEY, J of TANENBAUM LAW LLC on behalf of MICHELLE OLK against SHOPRITE OF NORTH BRUNSWICK, RENAISSANCE CTR AT NORTH BRUNSWICK, LLC, JOHN DOE 1-5, ABC CORP. 1-5 | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL [LCV2023466437] -Incorrect docket number on document. Please resubmit under Voluntary Dismissal with the correct docket number. | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL submitted by KOBLENTZ, HARLEY, J of TANENBAUM LAW LLC on behalf of MICHELLE OLK against SHOPRITE OF NORTH BRUNSWICK, RENAISSANCE CTR AT NORTH BRUNSWICK, LLC, JOHN DOE 1-5, ABC CORP. 1-5 | |
February 04, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for MID-L-004717-22 submitted by TANENBAUM, STEVEN M, TANENBAUM LAW LLC on behalf of MICHELLE OLK against SHOPRITE OF NORTH BRUNSWICK, RENAISSANCE CTR AT NORTH BRUNS, JOHN DOE 1-5, ABC CORP. 1-5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.