Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Truist Bank Successor By Merge, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Scott J Best, against Donald Howard, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with R Brian Mclaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeR Brian Mclaughlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
This complaint is filed by Truist Bank, successor by merger to Branch Banking and Trust Company, against the defendant, Donald Howard. The plaintiff states that they are the holder of a credit and/or loan agreement with the defendant, who has default...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 23, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 29, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 27, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: DONALD HOWARD | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT [LCV2023360002] -DEFAULT ENTERED A/T D. HOWARD. | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by BEST, SCOTT, J of WELTMAN WEINBERG & REIS CO LPA on behalf of TRUIST BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGE against DONALD HOWARD | |
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by BEST, SCOTT, J of WELTMAN WEINBERG & REIS CO LPA on behalf of TRUIST BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGE against DONALD HOWARD | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for MER-L-001654-22 submitted by BEST, SCOTT J, WELTMAN WEINBERG & REIS CO LPA on behalf of TRUIST BANK SUCCESSOR BY MERGE against DONALD HOWARD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.