Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gustavo Berganza, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kevin S Riechelson, against Christoph A Fernandes, Ciocca Chevrolet Ofprinceton, John Does I-V, represented by Christopher P Morgan, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Douglas H Hurd presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H Hurd Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This complaint is filed by Gustavo Berganza against defendants Christoph A. Fernandes and Ciocca Chevrolet of Princeton, as well as John Does I-V. The complaint alleges that on February 5, 2021, Berganza's vehicle was involved in an accident with a C...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: Motion Result: Withdrawn on 08/04/2023 re: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY LCV20232239074 on CONSOLIDATED CASE MER-L -001600-22 | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by FOTI, WILLIAM, BLAIR of GARCES GRABLER & LEBROCQ, PC on behalf of ELFEGO QUIROZ against CHRISTOPH A FERNANDES, CIOCCA CHEVROLET OF PRINCETON, GUSTAVO BERGANZA, RONY O BERREONDO on CONSOLIDATED CASE MER-L -001600-22 | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | INFORMATION: MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY submitted by FOTI, WILLIAM, BLAIR of GARCES GRABLER & LEBROCQ, PC on behalf of ELFEGO QUIROZ against CIOCCA CHEVROLET OF PRINCETON on CONSOLIDATED CASE MER-L -001600-22 | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by MORGAN, CHRISTOPHER, P of DENGLER & LIPSKI on behalf of CHRISTOPH A FERNANDES, CIOCCA CHEVROLET OF PRINCETON against GUSTAVO BERGANZA | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Vacating Default And Extending Time To Answer - GRANTED by Judge HURD, DOUGLAS, H | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by MORGAN, CHRISTOPHER, P of DENGLER & LIPSKI on behalf of CHRISTOPH A FERNANDES, CIOCCA CHEVROLET OF PRINCETON against GUSTAVO BERGANZA | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT [LCV2023768233] -Other; Default has been entered against defendants Ciocca Chevrolet of Princeton and Christopher Fernandes. | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by RIECHELSON, KEVIN, S of KAMENSKY COHEN & RIECHELSON on behalf of GUSTAVO BERGANZA against CHRISTOPH A FERNANDES, CIOCCA CHEVROLET OF PRINCETON, JOHN DOES I-V | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by KEVIN S RIECHELSON | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS submitted by RIECHELSON, KEVIN, S of KAMENSKY COHEN & RIECHELSON on behalf of GUSTAVO BERGANZA against CHRISTOPH A FERNANDES, CIOCCA CHEVROLET OF PRINCETON, JOHN DOES I-V |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.