Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Craig Durden, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Lance D Brown, against Abc Corps 1-100, John Does 1-100, Robert Wood Johnsonuniversity, Ruby Singh Rn, represented by Roseann L Brenner, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Douglas H Hurd presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H Hurd Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent Order - GRANTED by Judge HURD, DOUGLAS, H | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by BRENNER, ROSEANN, L of GOLDFEIN & JOSEPH, PC on behalf of ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL HAMILTON, RUBY SINGH RN against CRAIG DURDEN | |
March 29, 2023 |
PROCEEDING
Judge: KAY WALCOTT-HENDERSON |
||
March 29, 2023 |
FERREIRA CONFERENCE
Judge: DOUGLAS H HURD |
||
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT submitted by BROWN, LANCE, D of LANCE BROWN & ASSOCIATES LLC on behalf of CRAIG DURDEN against ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL HAMILTON, RUBY SINGH RN, JOHN DOES 1-100, ABC CORPS 1-100 | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE: AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT REQUIRED by 02/05/2023.Pursuant N.J.S.A. 2A:53A-27 an affidavit must be filed within 60 days of the filing of the answer to the complaint.The Affidavit of Merit is necessary to avoid dismissal with prejudice. | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR FILING OF DOCUMENT - Granted by Judge WALCOTT-HENDERSON, KAY re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20224156469] | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by BRENNER, ROSEANN, L of GOLDFEIN & JOSEPH, PC on behalf of ROBERT WOOD JOHNSON UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL HAMILTON, RUBY SINGH RN against CRAIG DURDEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.