Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Diego Rainis, Dorothee Rainis, filed a(n) Other case represented by Jeffrey S Nowak, against 0 Abc Corporations 1-1, Advanced Fence Systems, Llc, John Does1-10, John Wiley, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with MCLAUGHLIN, R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCLAUGHLIN, R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PROOF HEARING submitted by NOWAK, JEFFREY, S of JEFFREY S. NOWAK on behalf of DIEGO RAINIS, DOROTHEE RAINIS against JOHN WILEY, ADVANCED FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: JOHN WILEY | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DEFAULT (OUT OF TIME)-Partial by Judge MCLAUGHLIN, R BRIAN re: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (OUT OF TIME) [LCV20231531295] | |
June 09, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DEFAULT (OUT OF TIME)
Judge: R BRIAN MCLAUGHLIN |
||
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/12/2023 was rescheduled to 06/09/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (OUT OF TIME) [LCV20231531295] | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/12/2023 will be decided on 06/09/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (OUT OF TIME) [LCV20231531295] | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT (OUT OF TIME) submitted by NOWAK, JEFFREY, S of JEFFREY S. NOWAK on behalf of DIEGO RAINIS, DOROTHEE RAINIS against JOHN WILEY | |
April 01, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by NOWAK, JEFFREY, S of JEFFREY S. NOWAK on behalf of DIEGO RAINIS, DOROTHEE RAINIS against JOHN WILEY, ADVANCED FENCE SYSTEMS, LLC, JOHN DOES1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE for Letter/Correspondence LCV2023979977 Other-You are an attorney and required to file on eCourts. Please resubmit on eCourts. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.