Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Shaquana Clayborn, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Karim K Arzadi, against 1-10 Abc Companies, Inc., City Of Trenton, County Of Mercer, Department Of Transportation, John Does 1-10, (total of 8) See All represented by Palmer James Richardson, Patrick Lawrence O'Hara, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Anthony M Massi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony M Massi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court Without Prejudice |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Shaquana Clayborn against Mark White and other defendants. The complaint alleges that on or about December 4, 2020, Shaquana Clayborn was the owner and operator of a vehicle that was involved in a collision...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 17, 2022Summons uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by KARIM K ARZADI
Date: October 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by ARZADI, KARIM, K of KARIM ARZADI on behalf of SHAQUANA CLAYBORN against STATE OF NEW JERSEY, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DISMISSAL-Granted by Judge MASSI, ANTHONY, M re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20224039835] | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 03/02/2023 re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20224039697] | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM-Granted by Judge MASSI, ANTHONY, M re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV20224047477] | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral Argument has been granted. Remote Re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV20224047477] is scheduled on 01/06/2023 with Judge MASSI, ANTHONY, M. Please contact the court for details on whether the proceeding will be held by Phone or Video | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20224039835] -Other: Oral argument is scheduled for January 23, 2023 at 11 am. A zoom link to follow. | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral Argument has been granted. Remote Re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20224039835] is scheduled on 01/06/2023 with Judge MASSI, ANTHONY, M. Please contact the court for details on whether the proceeding will be held by Phone or Video | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20224039697] -Other: Oral argument is scheduled for January 23, 2023 at 11 am. A zoom link to follow. | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, FAILURE TO STATE CLAIM [LCV20224047477] -Other: Oral argument is scheduled for January 23, 2023 at 11 am. A zoom link to follow. | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Oral Argument has been granted. Remote Re: MOTION FOR DISMISSAL [LCV20224039697] is scheduled on 12/16/2022 with Judge MASSI, ANTHONY, M. Please contact the court for details on whether the proceeding will be held by Phone or Video |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.