Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Andre Burnett, Cynthia Moore, Tera Burnett, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kristy L Bruce, against John Doe, Platinum Hardwood Floors, Llc, Richard Roe, Rodrigo R Silveira, represented by Mary E Mc Laughlin, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Douglas H Hurd presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H Hurd Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeTransferred To Another County |
This complaint is filed by plaintiffs Tera Burnett, Cynthia Moore, and Andre Burnett against defendants Rodrigo Rafael Silveira, Platinum Hardwood Floors, LLC, John Doe(s) (1-5), and Richard Roe(s) (1-5). The complaint alleges negligence on the part ...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 16, 2022Summons uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by KRISTY L BRUCE
Date: December 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | This case has been transferred from MER-L-1601-22 to MON-L-259-23 | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by KRISTY L BRUCE | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by MC LAUGHLIN, MARY, E of PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE CO on behalf of RODRIGO R SILVEIRA, PLATINUM HARDWOOD FLOORS, LLC against TERA BURNETT, CYNTHIA MOORE, ANDRE BURNETT | |
November 28, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS submitted by BRUCE, KRISTY, L of RUBINSTEIN LAW FIRM LLC on behalf of TERA BURNETT, CYNTHIA MOORE, ANDRE BURNETT against RODRIGO R SILVEIRA, PLATINUM HARDWOOD FLOORS, LLC, JOHN DOE(S) (1-5), RICHARD ROE(S) (1-5) | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for MER-L-001601-22 submitted by BRUCE, KRISTY L, RUBINSTEIN LAW FIRM LLC on behalf of TERA BURNETT, CYNTHIA MOORE, ANDRE BURNETT against RODRIGO R SILVEIRA, PLATINUM HARDWOOD FLOORS, LLC, JOHN DOE(S) (1-5), RICHARD ROE(S) (1-5) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.