Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
John Maxwell, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Deborah R Gough, against 1-50 Jane Doe Dieticians, 1-50 John Doe Physicians, Abc Corporation, Abc Partnership, Brianna Acacia, (total of 20) See All represented by Andrew F Albero, Cathleen Kelly Rebar, Mary Ann Nobile Wilderotter, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Douglas H Hurd presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H Hurd Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 16, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 28, 2023CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge WALCOTT-HENDERSON, KAY re: CONSENT ORDER
Date: January 20, 2023ORDER FOR DISMISSAL - Granted by Judge WALCOTT-HENDERSON, KAY re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV2023454113]
Date: February 08, 2023Consent Order - GRANTED by Judge WALCOTT-HENDERSON, KAY
Date: January 23, 2023Consent Order - GRANTED by Judge WALCOTT-HENDERSON, KAY
Date: February 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by WILDEROTTER, MARY ANN, NOBILE of RONAN TUZZIO & GIANNONE, PA on behalf of MORRIS HALL ST. LAWRENCE INC., ST. LAWRENCE REHAB CENTER against JOHN MAXWELL, AS ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR NANCY MAXWELL, CAPITAL HEALTH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ABC CORPORATION, PRABHJOT PANDHER RN ET AL. | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by ALBERO, ANDREW, F of LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP on behalf of CAPITAL HEALTH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PRABHJOT PANDHER RN, SHRIJANA BANJARA RN, INESSA CHAYKOVSKA RN, CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM INC. ET AL. against JOHN MAXWELL, AS ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR NANCY MAXWELL, ABC CORPORATION, ABC PARTNERSHIP, MORRIS HALL ST. LAWRENCE INC. ET AL. | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by GOUGH, DEBORAH, R of THE GOUGH LAW FIRM on behalf of JOHN MAXWELL, AS ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR NANCY MAXWELL against CAPITAL HEALTH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PRABHJOT PANDHER RN, SHRIJANA BANJARA RN, INESSA CHAYKOVSKA RN, MORRIS HALL ST. LAWRENCE INC. ET AL. | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Extend Discovery - GRANTED by Judge HURD, DOUGLAS, H | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | 5-DAY ORDER submitted by GOUGH, DEBORAH, R of THE GOUGH LAW FIRM on behalf of JOHN MAXWELL, AS ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR NANCY MAXWELL against CAPITAL HEALTH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PRABHJOT PANDHER RN, SHRIJANA BANJARA RN, INESSA CHAYKOVSKA RN, MORRIS HALL ST. LAWRENCE INC. ET AL. | |
April 26, 2023 |
FERREIRA CONFERENCE
Judge: DOUGLAS H HURD |
||
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by WILDEROTTER, MARY ANN, NOBILE of RONAN TUZZIO & GIANNONE, PA on behalf of MORRIS HALL ST. LAWRENCE INC., ST. LAWRENCE REHAB CENTER against JOHN MAXWELL, AS ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR NANCY MAXWELL, CAPITAL HEALTH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ABC CORPORATION, PRABHJOT PANDHER RN ET AL. | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by ALBERO, ANDREW, F of LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP on behalf of CAPITAL HEALTH REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PRABHJOT PANDHER RN, INESSA CHAYKOVSKA RN, CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM INC., CAPITAL HEALTH MEDICAL CENTER HOPEWELL ET AL. against JOHN MAXWELL, AS ATTORNEY IN FACT FOR NANCY MAXWELL, ABC CORPORATION, ABC PARTNERSHIP, MORRIS HALL ST. LAWRENCE INC. ET AL. | |
March 17, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT
Judge: DOUGLAS H HURD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.