Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
William Saunders, filed a(n) Civil Rights case against City Of Princeton, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Douglas H Hurd presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H Hurd Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryCivil Rights |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
Order For Indigency - GRANTED by Judge HURD, DOUGLAS, H
Date: September 14, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 01, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 28, 2023Motion To Substitute Service uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by SAUNDERS WILLIAM
Date: September 14, 2022Complaint With Jury Demand uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by SAUNDERS WILLIAM
Date: September 14, 2022Motion To Reconsider uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by SAUNDERS WILLIAM
Date: April 17, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER RECONSIDER-Denied by Judge HURD, DOUGLAS, H re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20231333381] | |
May 12, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO RECONSIDER
Judge: DOUGLAS H HURD |
||
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/17/2023 will be decided on 05/12/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO RECONSIDER [LCV20231333381] | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion To Reconsider uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by SAUNDERS WILLIAM | |
April 01, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 28, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCE - NO DISMISSAL-Denied by Judge HURD, DOUGLAS, H re: MOTION FOR EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCE - NO DISMISSAL [LCV20223488803] | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTE SERVICE-Denied by Judge HURD, DOUGLAS, H re: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE [LCV20223488719] | |
October 21, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCE - NO DISMISSAL
Judge: DOUGLAS H HURD |
||
October 21, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Judge: DOUGLAS H HURD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.