Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jesse N Amankwaah, Kim L Tormondson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dylan T Trochtenberg, George F Hendricks, against Kim L Tormondson, Liberty Mutual Insurance Co, represented by Dylan T Trochtenberg, Gilbert Samuel Hoffman, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with R BRIAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeR BRIAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Jesse N. Amankwaah against Kim L. Tormondson in the Superior Court of New Jersey, Mercer County, Law Division. The complaint alleges that on or about March 1, 2021, Jesse N. Amankwaah was operating a motor ...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO ENFORCE LITIGANTS RIGHTS
Judge: R BRIAN MCLAUGHLIN |
||
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENFORCE LITIGANTS RIGHTS submitted by TROCHTENBERG, DYLAN, T of WEIR ATTORNEYS on behalf of KIM L TORMONDSON, KIM L TORMONDSON against JESSE N AMANKWAAH, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 08/03/2023 will be decided on 08/25/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO ENFORCE LITIGANTS RIGHTS [LCV20232246626] | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by HOFFMAN, GILBERT, SAMUEL of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO against JESSE N AMANKWAAH, KIM L TORMONDSON *LINKED FILING* | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 05/24/2023 re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231605385] | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY submitted by HOFFMAN, GILBERT, SAMUEL of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO against JESSE N AMANKWAAH, KIM L TORMONDSON *LINKED FILING* | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/CounterClaim ,CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by HOFFMAN, GILBERT, SAMUEL of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO on behalf of KIM L TORMONDSON against JESSE N AMANKWAAH | |
March 03, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: R BRIAN MCLAUGHLIN |
||
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by TROCHTENBERG, DYLAN, T of WEIR ATTORNEYS on behalf of KIM L TORMONDSON against JESSE N AMANKWAAH *LINKED FILING* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.