Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Juan Liu, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by J Robert Bratman, against Allied Beverage Group, Llc, Brian Devereaux, Fictitiou S Abc Companies 1-10 (, Itious De S John Does 1-10 (Fict, represented by Everett Edwin Gale, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with MASSI, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMASSI, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This complaint is filed by Juan Liu against Allied Beverage Group, LLC; Brian Devereaux; ABC Companies 1-10 (fictitious designations); and John Does 1-10 (fictitious designations). The complaint alleges that on or about September 30, 2020, Juan Liu w...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRECTION: re: [LCV20232309719] CONSENT ORDER submitted by BRATMAN, J, ROBERT of STARK & STARK PC on behalf of JUAN LIU against ALLIED BEVERAGE GROUP, LLC, BRIAN DEVEREAUX, ABC COMPANIES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DESIGNATIONS), JOHN DOES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DESIGNATIONS) Filing Type has been changed to DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION by Case Management Staff | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRECTED: CONSENT ORDER submitted by BRATMAN, J, ROBERT of STARK & STARK PC on behalf of JUAN LIU against ALLIED BEVERAGE GROUP, LLC, BRIAN DEVEREAUX, ABC COMPANIES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DESIGNATIONS), JOHN DOES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DESIGNATIONS) | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 12, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: ANTHONY M MASSI |
||
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by BRATMAN, J, ROBERT of STARK & STARK PC on behalf of JUAN LIU against ALLIED BEVERAGE GROUP, LLC, BRIAN DEVEREAUX, ABC COMPANIES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DESIGNATIONS), JOHN DOES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DESIGNATIONS) *LINKED FILING* | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 05/10/2023 re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231331840] | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/21/2023 will be decided on 05/12/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231331840] | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY submitted by BRATMAN, J, ROBERT of STARK & STARK PC on behalf of JUAN LIU against ALLIED BEVERAGE GROUP, LLC, BRIAN DEVEREAUX, ABC COMPANIES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DESIGNATIONS), JOHN DOES 1-10 (FICTITIOUS DESIGNATIONS) *LINKED FILING* | |
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by GALE, EVERETT, EDWIN of ZIRULINK DEMILLE & FLYNN on behalf of BRIAN DEVEREAUX against ALLIED BEVERAGE GROUP, LLC | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Vacating Default And Extending Time To Answer - GRANTED by Judge MASSI, ANTHONY, M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.