Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hannah Edwards, John Edwards, Nash Edwards, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Jordan S Goldsmith, against Abc Corporations, Anjali Sharma, D.O., Capital Health Medical Center, Capital Health System, Inc., Cecile Besingi, M.D., (total of 8) See All represented by Emily Lea Bock, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Douglas H Hurd presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H Hurd Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
This complaint is filed by the plaintiffs, Nash Edwards, an infant, through his mother and natural guardian, Hannah Edwards, and his father and natural guardian, John Edwards. The defendants named in the complaint include physicians Cecile Besingi, J...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: DOUGLAS H HURD |
||
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by GOLDSMITH, JORDAN, S of COHN LIFLAND PEARLMAN HERRMANN & KNOPF on behalf of AN INFANT, AS MOTHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN, AS FATHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN, INDIVIDUALLY, INDIVIDUALLY against CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., A THROUGH Z (FICTITIOUS NAMES AND PRESENTLY UNKNOWN),, CECILE BESINGI, M.D., JANINE D GALE, M.D., ANJALI SHARMA, D.O. ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 05/25/2023 re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231324022] | |
May 12, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: DOUGLAS H HURD |
||
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by COURTNEY, MARCIE, A of POST & SCHELL, P.C. on behalf of CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., CECILE BESINGI, M.D., JANINE D GALE, M.D., ANJALI SHARMA, D.O., JULIANNE HUGHES, M.D. ET AL. against AN INFANT, AS MOTHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN, AS FATHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN, INDIVIDUALLY, INDIVIDUALLY *LINKED FILING* | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/20/2023 was rescheduled to 05/26/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231324022] | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 04/20/2023 will be decided on 05/12/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20231324022] | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY submitted by GOLDSMITH, JORDAN, S of COHN LIFLAND PEARLMAN HERRMANN & KNOPF on behalf of AN INFANT, AS MOTHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN, AS FATHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN, INDIVIDUALLY, INDIVIDUALLY against CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., A THROUGH Z (FICTITIOUS NAMES AND PRESENTLY UNKNOWN),, A THROUGH Z (FICTITIOUS NAMES AND PRESENTLY UNKNOWN),, A THROUGH Z (FICTITIOUS NAMES AND PRESENTLY UNKNOWN),, CECILE BESINGI, M.D. ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (NOT THE FIRST PAPER) submitted by BOCK, EMILY, LEA of POST & SCHELL, P.C. on behalf of CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., CECILE BESINGI, M.D., JANINE D GALE, M.D., ANJALI SHARMA, D.O., JULIANNE HUGHES, M.D. ET AL. against AN INFANT, AS MOTHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN, AS FATHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN, INDIVIDUALLY, INDIVIDUALLY | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | FERREIRA CONFERENCE WAIVED submitted by KOOB, KATHARINE, C of POST & SCHELL, P.C. on behalf of CAPITAL HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., CECILE BESINGI, M.D., JANINE D GALE, M.D., ANJALI SHARMA, D.O., JULIANNE HUGHES, M.D. ET AL. against AN INFANT, AS MOTHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN, AS FATHER AND NATURAL GUARDIAN, INDIVIDUALLY, INDIVIDUALLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.