Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Deidra Mcconnell, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Thomas R Smith, against Abc, Inc, Asiel Taxi Llc, John Doe, Yamilette Camachobaez, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Douglas H Hurd presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H Hurd Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 22, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY submitted by GRIEGEL, STEVEN, WAYNE of ROSELLI GRIEGEL LOZIER & LAZZARO PC on behalf of DEIDRA MCCONNELL against ASIEL TAXI LLC | |
March 25, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: ASIEL TAXI LLC | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: YAMILETTE CAMACHOBAEZ | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT [LCV2023993931] -Other; default has been entered against defendants Yamilette Camachobaez and Asiel Taxi LLC. | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by SMITH, THOMAS, R of ROSELLI GRIEGEL LOZIER & LAZZARO PC on behalf of DEIDRA MCCONNELL against YAMILETTE CAMACHOBAEZ, ASIEL TAXI LLC, JOHN DOE, ABC, INC | |
January 21, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by LAZZARO, JAMES of ROSELLI GRIEGEL LOZIER & LAZZARO PC on behalf of DEIDRA MCCONNELL against YAMILETTE CAMACHOBAEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.