Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lm Insurance Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lauri A Hudson, against Road Chief Limited Liability, represented by Antranig, J Aslanian, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with Douglas H Hurd presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDouglas H Hurd Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeReinstated |
This complaint is a legal document filed by LM Insurance Corporation against Road Chief Limited Liability Company, also known as Road Chief LLC. The complaint alleges that the defendant failed to pay for goods and/or services provided by the plaintif...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2023 | ARBITRATION HEARING | ||
August 28, 2023 |
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: DOUGLAS H HURD |
||
August 17, 2023 | AUTO ARBITRATION | ||
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Settlement Conference" Proceeding for MER-L-001579-22 has been scheduled for 08/28/2023. | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | General Correspondence submitted by Court | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Arbitration Hearing" Proceeding for MER-L-001579-22 has been re-scheduled as a "Auto Arbitration" Proceeding for 08/17/2023. | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Arbitration Hearing" Proceeding for MER-L-001579-22 scheduled for 09/06/2023 has been: "Adjourned-trial Counsel Unavail (not Designated)". | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.