Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Peter Maa, filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by H Benjamin Sharlin, against Abc Corporations, Davys Landscaping Services Llc, Harold Camacho, John Does 1-3, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with R BRIAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeR BRIAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
CategoryConstruction |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypeConstruction |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiff Peter Maa against Defendants Davys Lawncare Services LLC, Davys Landscaping Services LLC, Harold Camacho, John Does (1-3), and ABC Corporations. The complaint alleges negligence, breach of contract, consumer fraud...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT - J [LCV20231509850] -Entered in the Civil Judgment and Order Docket in the Superior Court Clerk's Office. J 056867 23 | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT - J submitted by SHARLIN, H, BENJAMIN of H. BENJAMIN SHARLIN LLC on behalf of PETER MAA against DAVYS LAWNCARE SERVICES LLC, DAVYS LANDSCAPING SERVICES LLC, HAROLD CAMACHO, JOHN DOES 1-3, ABC CORPORATIONS | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT-Granted by Judge MCLAUGHLIN, R BRIAN re: MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT [LCV20231012266] | |
April 14, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Judge: R BRIAN MCLAUGHLIN |
||
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 03/23/2023 will be decided on 04/14/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT [LCV20231012266] | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT submitted by SHARLIN, H, BENJAMIN of H. BENJAMIN SHARLIN LLC on behalf of PETER MAA against DAVYS LAWNCARE SERVICES LLC, DAVYS LANDSCAPING SERVICES LLC, HAROLD CAMACHO, JOHN DOES 1-3, ABC CORPORATIONS | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: HAROLD CAMACHO | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: DAVYS LANDSCAPING SE RVICES LL C | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: DAVYS LAWNCARE SERVI CES LLC | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: REQUEST FOR DEFAULT [LCV20224175727] -Default entered a/t all defendants. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.