Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Amon Baldwin, Shikeya D Walker, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Michael R Paglione, against 0 Xyz Partnership 1-10, 200 Xyz Partnership 101-, Eric Cintron, John Jane Doe 1-100, in the jurisdiction of Mercer County, NJ, . Mercer County, NJ Superior Courts with R Brian Mclaughlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeR Brian Mclaughlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMercer County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeSett-Not Sched Trial,Arbitr, Or Othr Cdr/Friend Hear Not Compl |
This complaint is filed by Shikeya D. Walker and Amon Baldwin against Eric Cintron, John/Jane Doe 1-100, ABC Corporation 1-100, and XYZ Partnership 1-100. The complaint alleges negligence on the part of Eric Cintron, who collided with a motor vehicle...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 09, 2022LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL submitted by BROTMAN, MARC, ADAM of SZAFERMAN LAKIND BLUMSTEIN & BLADER PC on behalf of SHIKEYA D WALKER, AMON BALDWIN against ERIC CINTRON | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT submitted by PAGLIONE, MICHAEL, R of SZAFERMAN LAKIND BLUMSTEIN & BLADER PC on behalf of SHIKEYA D WALKER, AMON BALDWIN against ERIC CINTRON, JOHN/JANE DOE 1-100, ABC CORPORATION 1-100, XYZ PARTNERSHIP 1-100, XYZ PARTNERSHIP 1-100 ET AL. | |
February 18, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by PAGLIONE, MICHAEL, R of SZAFERMAN LAKIND BLUMSTEIN & BLADER PC on behalf of SHIKEYA D WALKER, AMON BALDWIN against ERIC CINTRON | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for MER-L-001564-22 submitted by PAGLIONE, MICHAEL R, SZAFERMAN LAKIND BLUMSTEIN & BLADER PC on behalf of SHIKEYA D WALKER, AMON BALDWIN against ERIC CINTRON, JOHN/JANE DOE 1-100, ABC CORPORATION 1-100, XYZ PARTNERSHIP 1-100, JOHN/JANE DOE 101-200 ET AL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.