Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Joy Penero, filed a(n) Um Or Uim Claim (Includes Bodily Injury) case represented by Lawrence H Madnick, against Abc Corp 1-10, Geico, represented by Joelle N Tadros, in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ, . Hudson County, NJ Superior Courts with Veronica Allende presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVeronica Allende Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2022 |
CategoryUm Or Uim Claim (Includes Bodily Injury) |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHudson County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2023 |
AUTO ARBITRATION
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: Answer w/Jury Demand [LCV20222445990] -Your case is scheduled for ARBITRATION on 07/19/23 with Patrick Metz, Esq., (973) 600-9675, Email: metz@damelegal.com. Please contact Mr. Metz to make arrangements for arbitrating remotely and directions on submitting your arbitration statement. | |
May 27, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Auto Arbitration" Proceeding for HUD-L-001765-22 has been scheduled for 07/19/2023. | |
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by TADROS, JOELLE, N of LAW OFFICES OF ERIC H BENNETT on behalf of GEICO against JOY PENERO, ABC CORP 1-10 | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: Complaint [LCV20222050378] -Please be advised that the case type has been changed to 621. | |
May 28, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for HUD-L-001765-22 submitted by MADNICK, LAWRENCE H, THOMAS A. MC CARTER, PC on behalf of JOY PENERO against GEICO, ABC CORP 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.