Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Margarito Flores, Melesia Flores, Palisades Safety Andinsurance, Palisades Safety & Ins. Assoc., filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Michael Riehl, against 1-5 Abc Ins. Co., Ashlee T Liggins, Blake A Bailey, John Does 1-5, Maryland Insurance Company, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ, . Hudson County, NJ Superior Courts with Veronica Allende presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVeronica Allende Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2022 |
CategoryPip Coverage |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationHudson County, NJ |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 10, 2022 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 05, 2022 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 08, 2022 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by RIEHL, MICHAEL of MICHAEL RIEHL, INC. on behalf of PALISADES SAFETY & INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, MARGARITO FLORES, MELESIA FLORES, PALISADES SAFETY AND INSURANCE ASSOCIATION against MARYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICES submitted by RIEHL, MICHAEL of MICHAEL RIEHL, INC. on behalf of PALISADES SAFETY & INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, MARGARITO FLORES, MELESIA FLORES, PALISADES SAFETY AND INSURANCE ASSOCIATION against MARYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY | |
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY CORRECTION submitted by RIEHL, MICHAEL of MICHAEL RIEHL, INC. on behalf of PALISADES SAFETY & INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, MARGARITO FLORES, MELESIA FLORES, PALISADES SAFETY AND INSURANCE ASSOCIATION against ASHLEE T LIGGINS, BLAKE A BAILEY, MARYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN DOES 1-5, ABC INSURANCE COMPANY 1-5 | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: DEFICIENCY CORRECTION [LCV20222168863] -Attorney ID # Required per Rule 1: 4-1(b). | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY CORRECTION submitted by RIEHL, MICHAEL of MICHAEL RIEHL, INC. on behalf of PALISADES SAFETY & INSURANCE ASSOCIATION, MARGARITO FLORES, MELESIA FLORES, PALISADES SAFETY AND INSURANCE ASSOCIATION against ASHLEE T LIGGINS, BLAKE A BAILEY, MARYLAND INSURANCE COMPANY, JOHN DOES 1-5, ABC INSURANCE COMPANY 1-5 | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: Complaint [LCV20222047879] -Attorney ID # Required per Rule 1: 4-1(b). |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.