Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
George S Hanna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dominick Succardi, against 1 To 10 Xyz Corporations, Abc Company, Daniel Santacruz, Es, M A L Builes Trucking, (total of 5) See All represented by Anthony Grossi, in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ, . Hudson County, NJ Superior Courts with TURULA, JOSEPH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTURULA, JOSEPH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHudson County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge TURULA, JOSEPH, A re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20231744231] | |
June 23, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/07/2023 will be decided on 06/23/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20231744231] | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY submitted by SUCCARDI, DOMINICK of SUCCARDI LAW FIRM LLC on behalf of GEORGE S HANNA against DANIEL SANTACRUZ, M A L BUILES TRUCKING, JOHN DOE AND JANE DOES (1 TO 10), ABC COMPANY, XYZ CORPORATIONS 1 TO 10 | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY submitted by SUCCARDI, DOMINICK of SUCCARDI LAW FIRM LLC on behalf of GEORGE S HANNA against DANIEL SANTACRUZ, M A L BUILES TRUCKING, JOHN DOE AND JANE DOES (1 TO 10), ABC COMPANY, XYZ CORPORATIONS 1 TO 10 | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by SUCCARDI, DOMINICK of LISA & SUCCARDI ATTORNEYS AT LAW on behalf of GEORGE S HANNA against DANIEL SANTACRUZ, M A L BUILES TRUCKING, JOHN DOE AND JANE DOES (1 TO 10), ABC COMPANY, XYZ CORPORATIONS 1 TO 10 | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION [LCV20231225210] -New discovery end date is 6/30/23. | |
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.