Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Josue Medina, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Edgar Joseph Navarrete, against Jamal B Totimeh, John Does, Plymouth Rock Assurance, Sullivan & Sons Delivery, Xyz Corp., (total of 5) See All represented by John C Simons, in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ, . Hudson County, NJ Superior Courts with Kimberly Espinales-Maloney presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKimberly Espinales-Maloney Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHudson County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeSett-Not Sched Trial,Arbitr, Or Othr Cdr/Friend Hear Not Compl |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division: Hudson County. The plaintiff, Josue Medina, alleges that on August 11, 2021, he was riding a bicycle and was struck by a vehicle operated by the defendant, Ja...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 27, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by FILZER, JOSHUA, A of HOAGLAND LONGO MORAN DUNST & DOUKAS on behalf of JAMAL B TOTIMEH, SULLIVAN & SONS DELIVERY against JOSUE MEDINA | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by SIMONS, JOHN, C of HOAGLAND LONGO MORAN DUNST & DOUKAS on behalf of JAMAL B TOTIMEH, SULLIVAN & SONS DELIVERY against JOSUE MEDINA | |
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by NAVARRETE, EDGAR, JOSEPH of EDGAR NAVARRETE, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JOSUE MEDINA against JAMAL B TOTIMEH, SULLIVAN & SONS DELIVERY, PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE, JOHN DOES (1-10), XYZ CORP. (1-10) | |
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by NAVARRETE, EDGAR, JOSEPH of EDGAR NAVARRETE, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JOSUE MEDINA against JAMAL B TOTIMEH, SULLIVAN & SONS DELIVERY, PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE, JOHN DOES (1-10), XYZ CORP. (1-10) | |
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE submitted by NAVARRETE, EDGAR, JOSEPH of EDGAR NAVARRETE, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JOSUE MEDINA against JAMAL B TOTIMEH, SULLIVAN & SONS DELIVERY, PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE, JOHN DOES (1-10), XYZ CORP. (1-10) | |
May 27, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for HUD-L-001740-22 submitted by NAVARRETE, EDGAR JOSEPH, EDGAR NAVARRETE, ESQ. LLC on behalf of JOSUE MEDINA against JAMAL B TOTIMEH, SULLIVAN & SONS DELIVERY, PLYMOUTH ROCK ASSURANCE, JOHN DOES (1-10), XYZ CORP. (1-10) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.