Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Edward Allen, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Raoul Bustillo, against Abc Corp. Nos 1-5, John Doe Nos. 1'5, Stop & Shop Giantfamily Fou, Stop & Shop Inc, The Stop & Shop Supermarket Co, (total of 5) See All represented by Daniel I Winter, in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ, . Hudson County, NJ Superior Courts with Veronica Allende presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVeronica Allende Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 23, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHudson County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeTransferred To Another Court |
DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: February 13, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: April 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND DISCOVERY-Denied by Judge TURULA, JOSEPH, A re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20231747778] | |
June 23, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REMOVAL submitted by HALL-GALE, JEFFREY, F of CULLEN & DYKMAN LLP on behalf of THE STOP & SHOP SUPERMARKET COMPANY LLC, STOP & SHOP INC, STOP & SHOP / GIANT FAMILY FOUNDATION INC. against EDWARD ALLEN, JOHN DOE NOS. 1'5, ABC CORP. NOS 1-5 | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge TURULA, JOSEPH, A re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20231633789] | |
June 09, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
June 09, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by BUSTILLO, RAOUL of RAOUL BUSTILLO, LLC on behalf of EDWARD ALLEN against THE STOP & SHOP SUPERMARKET COMPANY LLC, STOP & SHOP INC, STOP & SHOP / GIANT FAMILY FOUNDATION INC., JOHN DOE NOS. 1'5, ABC CORP. NOS 1-5 *LINKED FILING* | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by HALL-GALE, JEFFREY, F of CULLEN & DYKMAN LLP on behalf of THE STOP & SHOP SUPERMARKET COMPANY LLC, STOP & SHOP INC, STOP & SHOP / GIANT FAMILY FOUNDATION INC. against EDWARD ALLEN, JOHN DOE NOS. 1'5, ABC CORP. NOS 1-5 *LINKED FILING* | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 06/08/2023 re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20231633692] | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/07/2023 will be decided on 06/23/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20231747778] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.