Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ryan Kasten, Stephanie Bolster, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gary D Hoffman, against 375 Baldwin Ave., Llp, Chester S Kidell, Cory Bussey, Keller William Citylife Realt, Tina Maneca, (total of 5) See All represented by Ellen M Mc Dowell, Maria Amalia Nieto, in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ, . Hudson County, NJ Superior Courts with KIMBERLY ESPINALES-MALONEY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKIMBERLY ESPINALES-MALONEY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 19, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHudson County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DISCOVERY-Denied by Judge ESPINALES-MALONEY, KIMBERLY re: MOTION FOR DISCOVERY [LCV20232414078] | |
September 08, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR DISCOVERY
Judge: KIMBERLY ESPINALES-MALONEY |
||
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR DISCOVERY [LCV20232414078] -Time Change-Oral argument Monday September 11th, 2023, at 10:00am. In person Brennan Courthouse 3rd floor, Jersey City. | |
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR DISCOVERY [LCV20232414078] -Oral argument has been scheduled before Judge Espinales-Maloney on Monday September 11th, 2023, at 9:00am. In person appearance, Brennan Courthouse 3rd floor, Jersey City. | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by HOFFMAN, GARY, D of HOFFMAN & HOFFMAN on behalf of RYAN KASTEN, STEPHANIE BOLSTER against CORY BUSSEY, 375 BALDWIN AVE., LLP, CHESTER S KIDELL | |
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF submitted by HOFFMAN, GARY, D of HOFFMAN & HOFFMAN on behalf of RYAN KASTEN, STEPHANIE BOLSTER against CORY BUSSEY, 375 BALDWIN AVE., LLP, CHESTER S KIDELL *LINKED FILING* | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MC DOWELL, ELLEN, M of MCDOWELL LAW, PC on behalf of CORY BUSSEY, 375 BALDWIN AVE., LLP, CHESTER S KIDELL against RYAN KASTEN, STEPHANIE BOLSTER *LINKED FILING* | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE submitted by HOFFMAN, GARY, D of HOFFMAN & HOFFMAN on behalf of RYAN KASTEN, STEPHANIE BOLSTER against CORY BUSSEY, 375 BALDWIN AVE., LLP, CHESTER S KIDELL | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge TURULA, JOSEPH, A re: MOTION FOR DISCOVERY [LCV20232304378] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.