Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Avraham Benshabat, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Paul Manuel Da Costa, against City Of Jersey City, City Of Jersey Citydepartment, Jersey City Parks Coalition, John Doe 1-10, Xyz Corporation 1-10, (total of 5) See All represented by Philip Samuel Adelman, in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ, . Hudson County, NJ Superior Courts with TURULA, JOSEPH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTURULA, JOSEPH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHudson County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 |
PERSONAL INJURY ARBITRATION
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Personal Injury Arbitration" Proceeding for HUD-L-001627-22 has been scheduled for 11/16/2023. | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge TURULA, JOSEPH, A re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20231872473] | |
July 21, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by SHLIONSKY, DENNIS, SAMUEL of SNYDER SARNO D'ANIELLO MACERI DA COSTA on behalf of AVRAHAM BENSHABAT against CITY OF JERSEY CITY, JERSEY CITY PARKS COALITION, CITY OF JERSEY CITY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS, JOHN DOE 1-10, XYZ CORPORATION 1-10 *LINKED FILING* | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/22/2023 will be decided on 07/21/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20231872473] | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY submitted by GOLNER, MICHAEL, SCOTT of CITY OF JERSEY CITY on behalf of CITY OF JERSEY CITY, CITY OF JERSEY CITY DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS against AVRAHAM BENSHABAT *LINKED FILING* | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by GOLNER, MICHAEL, SCOTT of CITY OF JERSEY CITY on behalf of CITY OF JERSEY CITY against AVRAHAM BENSHABAT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.