Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Miriam Kitrick, Miriam Peralta, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kathleen M Reilly, against Abc Corporation, Angel L Gomez, County Of Hudson, Donna Mcclure, Happy Time Pre School & Day Ca, (total of 12) See All represented by Benjamin J Tursi, John J Grossi, Monique Danielle Moreira, Shane A Williams, in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ, . Hudson County, NJ Superior Courts with DELIA, ANTHONY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDELIA, ANTHONY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 13, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHudson County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 23, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 08, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 28, 2023DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 |
PERSONAL INJURY ARBITRATION
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT-Granted by Judge DELIA, ANTHONY, V re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20231868096] | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT-Granted by Judge DELIA, ANTHONY, V re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20231874271] | |
August 04, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: ANTHONY V DELIA |
||
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20231874271] -Oral argument is scheduled with Judge D'Elia on August 4, 2023 at 9:30 am. You will receive an email invitation to join the hearing via zoom. After joining the hearing at this time, you may have to briefly wait until you are admitted. | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20231868096] -Oral argument is scheduled with Judge D'Elia on August 4, 2023 at 9:30 am. You will receive an email invitation to join the hearing via zoom. After joining the hearing at this time, you may have to briefly wait until you are admitted. | |
August 02, 2023 |
PERSONAL INJURY ARBITRATION
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by GROSSI, JOHN, J of CAREY & GROSSI PC on behalf of ANGEL LUIS GOMEZ, MIRTHA A GOMEZ against MIRIAM PERALTA, MIRIAM KITRICK, JANE DOE, ABC CORPORATION, XYZ PARTNERSHIP ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20232220072] -Please be advised that the Court will not consider your opposition to Town of Kearny's Motion for Summary Judgment due to its late filing. | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE submitted by GARTSIDE, CHLOE, ELIZABETH of MARKS O'NEILL O'BRIEN DOHERTY & KELLY on behalf of DONNA MCCLURE, HAPPY TIME PRE SCHOOL & DAY CARE against TOWN OF KEARNY *LINKED FILING* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.