Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Humberto Rodriguez, Jacquelin C Junga, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jeffrey Marc Bloom, against Green Jen, Inc, John Does 1-10, Maher Terminal Llc, Miguel F Aguilar, Port Authority Of Ny& Nj, (total of 7) See All represented by Christopher John Buggy, Christopher N Leeds, Christopher R Paldino, in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ, . Hudson County, NJ Superior Courts with Veronica Allende presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVeronica Allende Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHudson County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/CrossClaim W/Jury Demand submitted by LEEDS, CHRISTOPHER, N of CIPRIANI & WERNER PC on behalf of MIGUEL F AGUILAR, SURAMP TRUCKING CORP against HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ, JACQUELINE CASAL JUNGA | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY CORRECTION submitted by LEEDS, CHRISTOPHER, N of CIPRIANI & WERNER PC on behalf of MIGUEL F AGUILAR, SURAMP TRUCKING CORP against HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ, JACQUELINE CASAL JUNGA | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FIRST PLEADING [LCV20232185448] -The required Case Information Statement for first pleading (R.4:5-1(b)) was not provided. | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by LEEDS, CHRISTOPHER, N of CIPRIANI & WERNER PC on behalf of MIGUEL F AGUILAR, SURAMP TRUCKING CORP against HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ, JACQUELINE CASAL JUNGA | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE - FIRST PLEADING submitted by LEEDS, CHRISTOPHER, N of CIPRIANI & WERNER PC on behalf of MIGUEL F AGUILAR, SURAMP TRUCKING CORP against HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ, JACQUELINE CASAL JUNGA | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20232186593] -Your pleading must be accompanied by an answer & CIS. | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231835273] -Request for Proof Hearing has been Denied. Please refer to R.4:43(b) and Comment 2.3 thereto. | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by CROSS, MICHAEL of CHIESA SHAHINIAN & GIANTOMASI PC on behalf of MAHER TERMINAL LLC against HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ, JACQUELINE CASAL JUNGA | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by BLOOM, JEFFREY, MARC of JEFFREY M. BLOOM on behalf of HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ, JACQUELINE CASAL JUNGA against MIGUEL F AGUILAR, SURAMP TRUCKING CORP, GREEN JEN, INC, MAHER TERMINAL LLC, PORT AUTHORITY OF NEW YORK AND NEW JERSEY ET AL. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.