Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Christina Nastos, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Lisa Ann Lehrer, against 2300 Summit Management Llc, Bb And Foods Llc, City Of Union City, County Of Hudson, John Does 1-10, (total of 9) See All represented by Alissa Lara Chang, Bernadette Ann Dronson, Steven A Jenks, in the jurisdiction of Hudson County, NJ, . Hudson County, NJ Superior Courts with Veronica Allende presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVeronica Allende Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationHudson County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2023 |
PERSONAL INJURY ARBITRATION
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Personal Injury Arbitration" Proceeding for HUD-L-001568-22 scheduled for 11/30/2023 has been: "Adjourned Discovery Incomplete". | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT submitted by BENVENISTI, STEVEN of DAVIS SAPERSTEIN & SALOMON PC on behalf of CHRISTINA NASTOS against M. SOPHER & CO. LLC, WARRIOR STAR TAEKWONDO LLC, 2300 SUMMIT MANAGEMENT LLC | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT-Granted by Judge TURULA, JOSEPH, A re: MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV20232109763] | |
August 04, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT
Judge: JOSEPH A TURULA |
||
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT submitted by BENVENISTI, STEVEN of DAVIS SAPERSTEIN & SALOMON PC on behalf of CHRISTINA NASTOS against M. SOPHER & CO. LLC, WARRIOR STAR TAEKWONDO LLC, BB AND FOODS LLC, CITY OF UNION CITY, COUNTY OF HUDSON ET AL. | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 07/18/2023 will be decided on 08/04/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV20232109763] | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by COLLINS, JOHN, J of HUDSON COUNTY COUNSEL on behalf of COUNTY OF HUDSON against CHRISTINA NASTOS | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by BENVENISTI, STEVEN of DAVIS SAPERSTEIN & SALOMON PC on behalf of CHRISTINA NASTOS against M. SOPHER & CO. LLC, WARRIOR STAR TAEKWONDO LLC | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT-Denied by Judge TURULA, JOSEPH, A re: CROSS MOTION TO FILE OR AMEND COMPLAINT [LCV20231783976] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.