Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Charles Avetian, Silva Avetian, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Timothy Mooney, against Robert Stansbury, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Pickering Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 15, 2022Writ Of Execution submitted by Court
Date: June 06, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT - J [LCV20231793243] -Entered in the civil judgment & order docket in the Superior Court Clerks Office J 071296 23. | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT - J submitted by HERMANOVICH, MARISA, J of KING BARNES, LLC on behalf of CHARLES AVETIAN, SILVA AVETIAN against ROBERT STANSBURY | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ Of Execution submitted by Court | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION submitted by KING, RICHARD, MICHAEL of KING BARNES, LLC on behalf of CHARLES AVETIAN, SILVA AVETIAN against ROBERT STANSBURY | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT-Granted by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H re: MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT [LCV20231492407] | |
May 26, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT submitted by HERMANOVICH, MARISA, J of KING BARNES, LLC on behalf of CHARLES AVETIAN, SILVA AVETIAN against ROBERT STANSBURY | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/09/2023 will be decided on 05/26/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION ENTERING DEFAULT JUDGMENT [LCV20231492407] | |
March 18, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: ROBERT STANSBURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.