Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Pacific Outdoor Advertising, filed a(n) Actions In Lieu Of Prerogative Writs case represented by Carl N Tripician, Reginald Jenkins, against Middle Township, Middle Twp Zoning Board Of Adj, represented by Matthew Paul Madden, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with Michael J Blee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J Blee Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2022 |
CategoryActions In Lieu Of Prerogative Writs |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: January 24, 2023Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge BLEE, MICHAEL, J
Date: January 23, 2023TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 10, 2022Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge BLEE, MICHAEL, J
Date: August 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2023 | PROCEEDING | ||
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge BLEE, MICHAEL, J | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by JENKINS, REGINALD of TRENK ISABEL SIDDIQI SHAHDANIAN, P.C. on behalf of PACIFIC OUTDOOR ADVERTISING against MIDDLE TWP ZONING BOARD OF ADJ, MIDDLE TOWNSHIP | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Management Order-Court Initiated - GRANTED by Judge BLEE, MICHAEL, J | |
January 23, 2023 | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Letter/Correspondence submitted by Richard Andrew De Michele of DE MICHELE & DE MICHELE, PC. JEDS EF-1780171 | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST submitted by JENKINS, REGINALD of TRENK ISABEL SIDDIQI SHAHDANIAN, P.C. on behalf of PACIFIC OUTDOOR ADVERTISING against MIDDLE TWP ZONING BOARD OF ADJ, MIDDLE TOWNSHIP | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: ADJOURNMENT REQUEST [LCV20224466086] -Request to adjourn proceeding has been granted; new date is Monday, January 23rd @ 9:30 a.m. via zoom. Please advise promptly if any problem with date/time by emailing Rose.Bradley@NJCourts.Gov. | |
December 20, 2022 | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.