Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Albertson'S Companies, Inc., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Steven M Pardalis, against Brandon Granger, Courtney Huff, David Bridgens, Edmund Wisham, Iii, Edward Huff, (total of 24) See All represented by Chad M Moore, David Rock Castellani, Durann A Neil, Harry D Mc Enroe, John Burke, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Pickering Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2022 |
CategoryTort-Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
January 05, 2024 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
December 16, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 15, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-COURT INITIATED - GRANTED by Judge JAMES H. PICKERING JR., J.S.C. | |
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Case Management Conference" Proceeding for CPM-L-000323-22 has been scheduled for 01/31/2024. | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 11/29/2023 was rescheduled to 01/05/2024. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20233490507] | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) submitted by GRIFFIN, THOMAS, WILLIAM of TRIFIOLIS & GRIFFIN, PC on behalf of PAULO BRIDGENS-DANIEL, DAVID BRIDGENS, DAVID BRIDGENS against ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES, INC. *LINKED FILING* | |
December 12, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY submitted by GRIFFIN, THOMAS, WILLIAM of TRIFIOLIS & GRIFFIN, PC on behalf of PAULO BRIDGENS-DANIEL, DAVID BRIDGENS, DAVID BRIDGENS against ALBERTSON'S COMPANIES, INC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.