Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ali Baahmed, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jennifer Torsiello Cassett, against Dominik Bradley, John Doe, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Pickering Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL submitted by CASSETT, JENNIFER, TORSIELLO of CASSETT LAW on behalf of ALI BAAHMED against DOMINIK BRADLEY, JOHN DOE | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTE SERVICE-Granted by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H re: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE [LCV20224187949] | |
January 06, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 12/12/2022 will be decided on 01/06/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE [LCV20224187949] | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SERVICE submitted by CASSETT, JENNIFER, TORSIELLO of CASSETT LAW on behalf of ALI BAAHMED against DOMINIK BRADLEY, JOHN DOE | |
August 27, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for CPM-L-000316-22 submitted by CASSETT, JENNIFER TORSIELLO, CASSETT LAW on behalf of ALI BAAHMED against DOMINIK BRADLEY, JOHN DOE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.