Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Natalie Ocasio, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by David Joseph Cowhey, against John Doe, Sharon Mcneal-Silnicki, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Pickering Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 26, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-COURT INITIATED - GRANTED by Judge JAMES H. PICKERING JR., J.S.C.
Date: August 03, 2023Answer w/CounterClaim uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by SHARON MCNEAL-SILNICKI
Date: October 14, 2022DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 05, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 16, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 02, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 04, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-COURT INITIATED - GRANTED by Judge JAMES H. PICKERING JR., J.S.C. | |
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Case Management Conference" Proceeding for CPM-L-000312-22 has been scheduled for 09/20/2023. | |
August 02, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 06, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Case Management Conference" Proceeding for CPM-L-000312-22 has been re-scheduled as a "Case Management Conference" Proceeding for 08/02/2023. | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Case Management Conference" Proceeding for CPM-L-000312-22 scheduled for 07/06/2023 has been: "Conferenced By Judge And Adjourned". | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.