Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Griselda Carrasco, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Frank L Rone, against Ana C Martinez-Roman, Gustavo Perez, John Doe, -V Abc Partnership, -V Xyz Corporation, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Pickering Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
This complaint is filed by Griselda Carrasco against defendants Gustovo Perez, Ana C. Martinez-Roman, John Does I-V, ABC Partnerships I-V, and XYZ Corporations I-V. The complaint alleges that on August 16, 2020, Griselda Carrasco was driving on the G...
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 16, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by RONE, FRANK, L of RONE & KOWALSKI LLC on behalf of GRISELDA CARRASCO against GUSTAVO PEREZ, ANA C MARTINEZ-ROMAN, JOHN DOE(S) I-V, ABC PARTNERSHIP(S) I-V | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO REINSTATE CASE-Granted by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H re: MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE [LCV20231588722] | |
June 09, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 05/19/2023 will be decided on 06/09/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE [LCV20231588722] | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO REINSTATE CASE submitted by RONE, FRANK, L of RONE & KOWALSKI LLC on behalf of GRISELDA CARRASCO against GUSTAVO PEREZ, ANA C MARTINEZ-ROMAN, JOHN DOE(S) I-V, ABC PARTNERSHIP(S) I-V, XYZ CORPORATION(S) I-V | |
February 25, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by RONE, FRANK, L of RONE & KOWALSKI LLC on behalf of GRISELDA CARRASCO against GUSTAVO PEREZ, ANA C MARTINEZ-ROMAN, JOHN DOE(S) I-V, ABC PARTNERSHIP(S) I-V, XYZ CORPORATION(S) I-V | |
December 24, 2022 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for CPM-L-000299-22 submitted by RONE, FRANK L, RONE & KOWALSKI LLC on behalf of GRISELDA CARRASCO against GUSTAVO PEREZ, ANA C MARTINEZ-ROMAN, JOHN DOE(S) I-V, ABC PARTNERSHIP(S) I-V, XYZ CORPORATION(S) I-V |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.