Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Michael Klemick, Thomas Welsh Builders Llc, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Carmelo Tony Torraca, Patrick C Joyce, against John Does 1-6, Ns 1-6 John Does Corporatio, Stephen W Beato Construction, Thomas Welsh Builders, Llc, Tim Shea, (total of 6) See All represented by Carmelo Tony Torraca, David Scott De Weese, Kevin M Mc Keon, Paul Daniel Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Pickering Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2022 |
CategoryPersonal Injury |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2024 | PERSONAL INJURY ARBITRATION | ||
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER EXTEND DISCOVERY-Granted by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20233304408] | |
December 01, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
November 17, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MC KEON, KEVIN, M of MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN on behalf of WHEELER ELECTRIC, INC. against MICHAEL KLEMICK, THOMAS WELSH BUILDERS LLC, THOMAS WELSH BUILDERS, LLC, TIM SHEA, JOHN DOES 1-6 ET AL. *LINKED FILING* | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by TORRACA, CARMELO, TONY of BBC LAW, LLP on behalf of THOMAS WELSH BUILDERS LLC, THOMAS WELSH BUILDERS, LLC against WHEELER ELECTRIC, INC. *LINKED FILING* | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 11/13/2023 re: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY [LCV20233201324] | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by MC KEON, KEVIN, M of MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN on behalf of WHEELER ELECTRIC, INC. against MICHAEL KLEMICK *LINKED FILING* | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY submitted by JOYCE, PATRICK, C of HYBERG WHITE & MANN PC on behalf of MICHAEL KLEMICK against THOMAS WELSH BUILDERS LLC, THOMAS WELSH BUILDERS, LLC, TIM SHEA, WHEELER ELECTRIC, INC., STEPHEN W BEATO CONSTRUCTION *LINKED FILING* | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 11/06/2023 will be decided on 12/01/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY [LCV20233304408] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.