Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Audrey Kernan, filed a(n) Whistleblower / Conscientious Employee Protection Act (Cepa) case represented by David Rock Castellani, against Carmine Taglialatella, Daisy Palumbo, E 1-5 John Doe And Jane Ro, Ingrid French, New Jersey Department Of Labor, (total of 10) See All represented by Alexis M Way, Stephanie M Mersch, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Pickering Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2022 |
CategoryWhistleblower / Conscientious Employee Protection Act (Cepa) |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 02, 2022DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: December 18, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 04, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 19, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 21, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: October 24, 2023COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: December 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2024 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Case Management Conference" Proceeding for CPM-L-000238-22 has been scheduled for 03/13/2024. | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-COURT INITIATED - Granted by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H re: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-COURT INITIATED | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 18, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by CASTELLANI, DAVID, ROCK of CASTELLANI LAW FIRM, LLC on behalf of AUDREY KERNAN against PHILLIP D MURPHY, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, NEW JERSEY DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, ROBERT ASARO-ANGELO, TENNILLE MCCOY ET AL. | |
November 13, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
November 04, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | The "Case Management Conference" Proceeding for CPM-L-000238-22 has been re-scheduled as a "Case Management Conference" Proceeding for 12/18/2023. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.