Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Katie Kurz, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Gregory Brian Noble, against Alfredo'S Pizzeria, Jane Doe I-V, John Doe I-V, Xyz Corporation I-V, represented by Colleen M Ready, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Pickering Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2022 |
CategoryLaw Against Discrimination (Lad) Cases |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2023 | Docket Event | MEDIATION Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - GRANTED by Judge JAMES H. PICKERING JR., J.S.C. | |
March 03, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by NOBLE, GREGORY, BRIAN of O'CONNOR PARSONS LANE & NOBLE LLC on behalf of KATIE KURZ against ALFREDO'S PIZZERIA, JANE DOE I-V, JOHN DOE I-V, XYZ CORPORATION I-V *LINKED FILING* | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by READY, COLLEEN, M of MARGOLIS EDELSTEIN on behalf of ALFREDO'S PIZZERIA against KATIE KURZ, JANE DOE I-V, JOHN DOE I-V, XYZ CORPORATION I-V | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 03/01/2023 re: MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT [LCV20224152229] | |
February 03, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT
Judge: JAMES H PICKERING JR |
||
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) submitted by NOBLE, GREGORY, BRIAN of O'CONNOR PARSONS LANE & NOBLE LLC on behalf of KATIE KURZ against ALFREDO'S PIZZERIA, JANE DOE I-V, JOHN DOE I-V, XYZ CORPORATION I-V *LINKED FILING* | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: ADJOURNMENT REQUEST (MOTION) [LCV2023406282] -Other - Motion carried 2 cycles per request | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 12/07/2022 was rescheduled to 03/03/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT [LCV20224152229] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.