Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Briggs Law Office, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Norman William Briggs, against Christoph Horan, Paint Local, D B A Affordable, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Pickering Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2022 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: June 17, 2022Writ Of Execution submitted by Court
Date: May 19, 2023Writ Of Execution submitted by Court
Date: May 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ Of Execution submitted by Court | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ Of Execution submitted by Court | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICES submitted by BRIGGS, NORMAN, WILLIAM of BRIGGS LAW OFFICE LLC on behalf of BRIGGS LAW OFFICE, LLC against CHRISTOPH HORAN, PAINT LOCAL, D/B/A AFFORDABLE | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION submitted by BRIGGS, NORMAN, WILLIAM of BRIGGS LAW OFFICE LLC on behalf of BRIGGS LAW OFFICE, LLC against CHRISTOPH HORAN, PAINT LOCAL, D/B/A AFFORDABLE | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WAGE EXECUTION submitted by BRIGGS, NORMAN, WILLIAM of BRIGGS LAW OFFICE LLC on behalf of BRIGGS LAW OFFICE, LLC against CHRISTOPH HORAN, PAINT LOCAL, D/B/A AFFORDABLE | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Correcting Clerical Error - GRANTED by Judge PICKERING JR, JAMES, H | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY CORRECTION submitted by BRIGGS, NORMAN, WILLIAM of BRIGGS LAW OFFICE LLC on behalf of BRIGGS LAW OFFICE, LLC against CHRISTOPH HORAN, PAINT LOCAL, D/B/A AFFORDABLE | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: WRIT OF EXECUTION - J [LCV20231203799] -Received but not filed. Proper attorney signature is missing. Please correct and resubmit for processing. | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION - J submitted by BRIGGS, NORMAN, WILLIAM of BRIGGS LAW OFFICE LLC on behalf of BRIGGS LAW OFFICE, LLC against CHRISTOPH HORAN, PAINT LOCAL, D/B/A AFFORDABLE | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: PAINT LOCAL, D/B/A A FFORDABLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.