Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Bryan Harron, filed a(n) Whistleblower / Conscientious Employee Protection Act (Cepa) case represented by Philip Smith Burnham, against Ard Estate Of Joseph Pic, Joseph Picard, Michael Voll, The City Of Cape May, represented by John Charles Grady, in the jurisdiction of Cape May County, NJ, . Cape May County, NJ Superior Courts with James H Pickering Jr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames H Pickering Jr Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2022 |
CategoryWhistleblower / Conscientious Employee Protection Act (Cepa) |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationCape May County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 28, 2022ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER - GRANTED by Judge JAMES H. PICKERING JR., J.S.C.
Date: November 09, 2022DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: July 03, 2023MEDIATION Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: August 06, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT submitted by GRADY, JOHN, CHARLES of COCKERILL, CRAIG & MOORE, LLC on behalf of THE CITY OF CAPE MAY, MICHAEL VOLL, JOSEPH PICARD, ARD ESTATE OF JOSEPH PIC against BRYAN HARRON | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT [LCV20232001823] -Other - Correction has been made and the case is dismissed. | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by GRADY, JOHN, CHARLES of COCKERILL, CRAIG & MOORE, LLC on behalf of THE CITY OF CAPE MAY, MICHAEL VOLL, JOSEPH PICARD, ARD ESTATE OF JOSEPH PIC against BRYAN HARRON | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by GRADY, JOHN, CHARLES of COCKERILL, CRAIG & MOORE, LLC on behalf of THE CITY OF CAPE MAY, MICHAEL VOLL, JOSEPH PICARD, ARD ESTATE OF JOSEPH PIC against BRYAN HARRON | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER - GRANTED by Judge JAMES H. PICKERING JR., J.S.C. | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by GRADY, JOHN, CHARLES of COCKERILL, CRAIG & MOORE, LLC on behalf of THE CITY OF CAPE MAY, MICHAEL VOLL, JOSEPH PICARD, ARD ESTATE OF JOSEPH PIC against BRYAN HARRON | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by BURNHAM, PHILIP, SMITH of BURNHAM DOUGLASS on behalf of BRYAN HARRON against THE CITY OF CAPE MAY, MICHAEL VOLL, JOSEPH PICARD, ARD ESTATE OF JOSEPH PIC | |
August 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MEDIATION Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED ANSWER submitted by GRADY, JOHN, CHARLES of COCKERILL, CRAIG & MOORE, LLC on behalf of THE CITY OF CAPE MAY, MICHAEL VOLL, JOSEPH PICARD, ARD ESTATE OF JOSEPH PIC against BRYAN HARRON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.