Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Tracy Snyder, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by William J O'Kane, against Abc Entities 1-5, Burlington County Spring Shop, Gondul Trucking, Inc., Jhobany Cruz, John Does 1-10, (total of 5) See All represented by Matthew Toto, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Anthony M Pugliese presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnthony M Pugliese Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER COMPEL DEPOSITION-Granted by Judge PUGLIESE, ANTHONY, M re: MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION [LCV20233377949] | |
December 01, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION
Judge: ANTHONY M PUGLIESE |
||
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION submitted by O'KANE, WILLIAM, J of ARCHER & GREINER PC on behalf of TRACY SNYDER against GONDUL TRUCKING, INC., JHOBANY CRUZ, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC ENTITIES 1-5, BURLINGTON COUNTY SPRING SHOP | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by O'KANE, WILLIAM, J of ARCHER & GREINER PC on behalf of TRACY SNYDER against GONDUL TRUCKING, INC., JHOBANY CRUZ, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC ENTITIES 1-5, BURLINGTON COUNTY SPRING SHOP | |
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 11/15/2023 will be decided on 12/01/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION [LCV20233377949] | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by O'KANE, WILLIAM, J of ARCHER & GREINER PC on behalf of TRACY SNYDER against BURLINGTON COUNTY SPRING SHOP | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: BURLINGTON COUNTY SP RING SHOP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.