Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hector Torres, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Stephen M Tatonetti, against Abc Entities, John Does, Norma Velez, represented by Robyn Amy Barkow, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Judith S Charny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudith S Charny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 24, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by BARKOW, ROBYN, AMY of GEICO INSURANCE on behalf of NORMA VELEZ against HECTOR TORRES | |
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event | OFFER OF JUDGMENT submitted by TATONETTI, STEPHEN, M of LOCKS LAW FIRM, LLC on behalf of HECTOR TORRES against NORMA VELEZ | |
November 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer W/Jury Demand submitted by BARKOW, ROBYN, AMY of LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL G. DAVID on behalf of NORMA VELEZ against HECTOR TORRES, JOHN DOES (1-10), ABC ENTITIES (1-10) | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICES submitted by TATONETTI, STEPHEN, M of LOCKS LAW FIRM, LLC on behalf of HECTOR TORRES against NORMA VELEZ | |
September 24, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint with Jury Demand for CAM-L-002499-22 submitted by TATONETTI, STEPHEN M, LOCKS LAW FIRM, LLC on behalf of HECTOR TORRES against NORMA VELEZ, JOHN DOES (1-10), ABC ENTITIES (1-10) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.