Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Hanover Insurance Company, Tsv Management, Inc., filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by David Morgan Blackwell, against 0 Abc Corporations 1-1, John Does 1-10, State Farm, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Judith S Charny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudith S Charny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2022 |
CategoryOther Insurance Claim (Including Declaratory Judgment Actions) |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Rule 1:13-7 |
LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: May 27, 2023LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: March 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 25, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE submitted by BLACKWELL, DAVID, MORGAN of DONNELLY MINTER & KELLY LLC on behalf of TSV MANAGEMENT, INC. against STATE FARM, RONNIE W HAAS, THE PLAZA GRANDE AT GARDEN STATE PARK CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, IN | |
September 24, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for CAM-L-002495-22 submitted by BLACKWELL, DAVID MORGAN, DONNELLY MINTER & KELLY LLC on behalf of HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY, TSV MANAGEMENT, INC. against STATE FARM, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10 | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY CORRECTION submitted by BLACKWELL, DAVID, MORGAN of DONNELLY MINTER & KELLY LLC on behalf of HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY, TSV MANAGEMENT, INC. against STATE FARM, JOHN DOES 1-10, ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, RONNIE W HAAS, THE PLAZA GRANDE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.