Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Ricciardi Bros. Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mitchell J Malzberg, against John Does 1-10, Nat'L Restoration, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Michael J Kassel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J Kassel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL submitted by MALZBERG, MITCHELL, J of MITCHELL J. MALZBERG, LLC on behalf of RICCIARDI BROS. INC. against NAT'L RESTORATION, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10 | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT submitted by MALZBERG, MITCHELL, J of MITCHELL J. MALZBERG, LLC on behalf of RICCIARDI BROS. INC. against NAT'L RESTORATION, LLC | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT [LCV2023461556] -Good afternoon Counsel, The court is in receipt of the stipulation of settlement filed and the docket has been marked accordingly. -Dan Megara, CSO (856)650-9100 x43142 | |
February 04, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for CAM-L-002481-22 submitted by MALZBERG, MITCHELL J, MITCHELL J. MALZBERG, LLC on behalf of RICCIARDI BROS. INC. against NAT'L RESTORATION, LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.