Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Rachel M Johnston, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ronald P Sierzega, against Guardian Termite & Pest Contro, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Michael J Kassel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J Kassel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeCompleted-Other Summary Proceeding |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ANSWER submitted by KLEIN, DANIEL, L of GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP on behalf of GUARDIAN TERMITE & PEST CONTROL, INC. against RACHEL M JOHNSTON | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ANSWER [LCV20224416367] -Other. Stipulation to extend time for answer is not being filed under the correct docket number. The correct docket this stipulation should be for under is L-2812-22. Please contact grace.horne@njcourts.gov with any questions. | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ANSWER submitted by KLEIN, DANIEL, L of GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP on behalf of GUARDIAN TERMITE & PEST CONTROL, INC. against RACHEL M JOHNSTON | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ANSWER [LCV20224078198] -Other-Please be advised that the documents must be filed under the docket# L 2812-22. Thank you. Evelyn 856-650-9100 ext 43139. | |
October 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT-Granted by Judge KASSEL, MICHAEL, J re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT [LCV20223427455] | |
October 21, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT
Judge: MICHAEL J KASSEL |
||
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT submitted by SIERZEGA, RONALD, P of PUFF, SIERZEGA & MACFEETERS LLC on behalf of RACHEL M JOHNSTON against GUARDIAN TERMITE & PEST CONTROL, INC. | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 09/23/2022 will be decided on 10/21/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO TRANSFER TO ANOTHER COURT [LCV20223427455] | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re: Complaint [LCV20223391817] -Other-Please be advised that the attached motion must be filed as a motion to transfer in order for the courts to schedule the matter. Thank you. Evelyn 856-650-9100 43139. | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion for CAM-L-002473-22 submitted by SIERZEGA, RONALD P, PUFF, SIERZEGA & MACFEETERS LLC on behalf of RACHEL M JOHNSTON against GUARDIAN TERMITE & PEST CONTRO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.