Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jacquelin M Plotts, Michael J Grainger, Ryan D Plotts, Tinkbuilt, Inc., filed a(n) Other case represented by Kevin Diduch, Robert W Slomicz, against John Does 1-5, Michael J Grainger, M Plotts,Jacqueline, Plotts, Ryan D, Tinkbuilt, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Kevin Diduch, Robert W Slomicz, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Michael J Kassel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J Kassel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
|
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER - Granted by Judge KASSEL, MICHAEL, J re: CONSENT ORDER [LCV20232215412] | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by SLOMICZ, ROBERT, W of THE SPADACCINI LAW FIRM LLC on behalf of TINKBUILT, INC., MICHAEL J GRAINGER, TINKBUILT, INC., MICHAEL J GRAINGER against RYAN D PLOTTS, JACQUELIN M PLOTTS, JOHN DOES 1-5, M PLOTTS,JACQUELINE, PLOTTS, RYAN D | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by SLOMICZ, ROBERT, W of THE SPADACCINI LAW FIRM LLC on behalf of TINKBUILT, INC., MICHAEL J GRAINGER, TINKBUILT, INC., MICHAEL J GRAINGER against RYAN D PLOTTS, JACQUELIN M PLOTTS, JOHN DOES 1-5, M PLOTTS,JACQUELINE, PLOTTS, RYAN D | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by DIDUCH, KEVIN of KD LAW GROUP on behalf of RYAN D PLOTTS, JACQUELIN M PLOTTS against TINKBUILT, INC., MICHAEL J GRAINGER, JOHN DOES 1-5 | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231291447] -Good afternoon Counsel, This notice will confirm the parties dismissed in error have been reinstated. -Dan Megara, CSO (856)650-9100 x43142 | |
April 08, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
February 04, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.