Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Carissa Carr, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Theodore Charles Levy, against Abc Corporation#1-10, Ana Leon, Geico Indemnity Company, John Doe #1-10, Shanelle Stovall, (total of 5) See All represented by Robyn Amy Barkow, Stephen D Williams, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Daniel A Bernardin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel A Bernardin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeReinstated |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
July 07, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: DANIEL A BERNARDIN |
||
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 07/05/2023 re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20231829714] | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by BARKOW, ROBYN, AMY of GEICO INSURANCE on behalf of GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY against CARISSA CARR *LINKED FILING* | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | OPPOSITION TO MOTION submitted by LEVY, THEODORE, CHARLES of FINE & STAUD on behalf of CARISSA CARR against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY *LINKED FILING* | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by BARKOW, ROBYN, AMY of GEICO INSURANCE on behalf of GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY against CARISSA CARR | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY submitted by BARKOW, ROBYN, AMY of GEICO INSURANCE on behalf of GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY against CARISSA CARR, SHANELLE STOVALL, ANA LEON, JOHN DOE #1-10, ABC CORPORATION#1-10 *LINKED FILING* | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 06/19/2023 will be decided on 07/07/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20231829714] | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.