Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Peter N Fish, against Clifford E Streater, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Daniel A Bernardin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDaniel A Bernardin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2022 |
CategoryBook Account (Debt Collection Matters Only) |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Court Without Prejudice |
TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: September 21, 2022Affidavit Of Service uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PETER N FISH
Date: November 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL submitted by PONDISH, GILBERT, TODD of ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES on behalf of U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION against CLIFFORD E STREATER | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by PONDISH, GILBERT, TODD of ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES on behalf of U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION against CLIFFORD E STREATER | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: CLIFFORD E STREATER | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Service uploaded by Case Management Staff submitted by PETER N FISH | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for CAM-L-002456-22 submitted by FISH, PETER N, ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES on behalf of U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION against CLIFFORD E STREATER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.