Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gardiner Funeral Home, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Andrew S Viola, against Joyce Guy, Of Helen L. Vezza, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Donald J Stein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald J Stein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: OF HELEN L. VEZZA | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by VIOLA, ANDREW, S of ANDREW S. VIOLA on behalf of GARDINER FUNERAL HOME against JOYCE GUY, OF HELEN L. VEZZA | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE submitted by VIOLA, ANDREW, S of ANDREW S. VIOLA on behalf of GARDINER FUNERAL HOME against JOYCE GUY, OF HELEN L. VEZZA | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: GENERAL CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20231479265] -Other: The request for default is as to Guy Joyce only. Anne McGinley 856-650-9100, ext 43145 | |
April 29, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL ORDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
April 01, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
February 25, 2023 | Docket Event | LACK OF PROSECUTION DISMISSAL WARNING Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Default has been entered against the following party/parties: JOYCE GUY | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DEFAULT submitted by VIOLA, ANDREW, S of ANDREW S. VIOLA on behalf of GARDINER FUNERAL HOME against JOYCE GUY, OF HELEN L. VEZZA | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.