Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of New Jersey, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by Linda C Spence, against 61780.00, Colton Cargen, represented by Robert C Wolf, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Donald J Stein presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald J Stein Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryForfeiture |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeInactive Forfeiture |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO PLACE INACTIVE - Granted by Judge STEIN, DONALD, J re: ORDER TO PLACE INACTIVE | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER submitted by SPENCE, LINDA, C of CAMDEN COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY against 61780.00, COLTON CARGEN | |
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer submitted by WOLF, ROBERT, C of THE WOLF LAW FIRM on behalf of 61780.00, COLTON CARGEN against STATE OF NEW JERSEY | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | TRACK ASSIGNMENT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint for CAM-L-002433-22 submitted by SPENCE, LINDA C, CAMDEN COUNTY PROSECUTORS OFFICE on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY against 61780.00, COLTON CARGEN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.