Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Velocity Investments, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adam Nichols, against Iain Page, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Steven J Polansky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven J Polansky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryContract/Commercial Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
COURT Notice submitted by Case Management
Date: November 11, 2022Court Initiated Correspondence submitted by Court
Date: November 18, 2022Court Initiated Correspondence submitted by Court
Date: November 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2022 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: STEVEN J POLANSKY |
||
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT-Granted by Judge POLANSKY, STEVEN, J re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20223787451] | |
December 02, 2022 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: STEVEN J POLANSKY |
||
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: COURT INITIATED CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20224000894] -Forward the Zoom link. Thank you. | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK NOTICE: re: COURT INITIATED CORRESPONDENCE [LCV20224000894] -Please be advised this case is in the Expedited Civil Pilot Program and is scheduled for a case management conference on Friday 12/9/22 @ 11:00am Via zoom before Judge Polansky. Please submit your email address to Dedre.price@njcourts.gov so I can | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Initiated Correspondence submitted by Court | |
November 11, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT Notice submitted by Case Management | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Initiated Correspondence submitted by Court | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 10/28/2022 will be decided on 12/02/2022. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT [LCV20223787451] | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT submitted by NICHOLS, ADAM of STEVEN COHEN LLC on behalf of VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC against IAIN PAGE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.