Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Westley Swanson, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ross Begelman, against , Independent Animal Care, Llc, John Doe, Monica Campolongo-Burke, represented by Jennifer A Hindermann, in the jurisdiction of Camden County, NJ, . Camden County, NJ Superior Courts with Steven J Polansky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSteven J Polansky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryAuto Negligence-Personal Injury (Non-Verbal Threshold) |
Last RefreshedAugust 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCamden County, NJ |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOpen |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: STEVEN J POLANSKY |
||
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY END DATE REMINDER Notice submitted by Case Management | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY submitted by HINDERMANN, JENNIFER, A of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE CO on behalf of MONICA CAMPOLONGO-BURKE, INDEPENDENT ANIMAL CARE, LLC against WESTLEY SWANSON | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 08/01/2023 will be decided on 08/25/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV20232223024] | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY EXTENSION STIPULATION submitted by HINDERMANN, JENNIFER, A of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE CO on behalf of MONICA CAMPOLONGO-BURKE, INDEPENDENT ANIMAL CARE, LLC against WESTLEY SWANSON, JOHN DOE (1-10), ABC BUSINESS ENTITY (1-10) | |
March 17, 2023 |
MOTION HEARING - MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY
Judge: STEVEN J POLANSKY |
||
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION submitted by HINDERMANN, JENNIFER, A of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE CO on behalf of MONICA CAMPOLONGO-BURKE, INDEPENDENT ANIMAL CARE, LLC against WESTLEY SWANSON, JOHN DOE (1-10), ABC BUSINESS ENTITY (1-10) *LINKED FILING* | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Result: Withdrawn on 03/09/2023 re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV2023634320] | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | The motion filed on 02/20/2023 will be decided on 03/17/2023. Do not come to the courthouse because no oral argument has been requested. The court's decision will be provided to you. Re: MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY [LCV2023634320] | |
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO MAKE DISCOVERY submitted by HINDERMANN, JENNIFER, A of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE CO on behalf of MONICA CAMPOLONGO-BURKE, INDEPENDENT ANIMAL CARE, LLC against WESTLEY SWANSON, JOHN DOE (1-10), ABC BUSINESS ENTITY (1-10) *LINKED FILING* |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.